(HC) Nielson v. Unknown
Petitioner: Richard Anthony Nielson
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 2:2023cv02744
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/16/2024 DEEMING the #4 , #5 and #6 Filings as non-responsive to the 12/6/2023 Order and GRANTING Petitioner 30 days to file a habeas corpus petition. (Spichka, K.)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Richard Anthony Nielson. (Spichka, K.)
January 5, 2024 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number 200004838 for $5.00 for Habeas Corpus from Richard A. Nielson. (Lopez, K)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST for correction of error by Richard Anthony Nielson re #1 Letter. (Woodson, A)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE re: disregard clerical error on #1 Letter by Richard Anthony Nielson. (Woodson, A)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE re: disregard clerical error on #1 Letter by Richard Anthony Nielson. (Woodson, A)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/06/2023 DISREGARDING #1 Letter and DIRECTING petitioner to file a petition and IFP Application or $5.00 filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Woodson, A)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, 2254 Form, and IFP form served on Richard Anthony Nielson. (Woodson, A)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Richard Anthony Nielson with CDCR number. (Spichka, K.)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lopez, K)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 [DISREGARDED pursuant to #3 Order] PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Unknown by Richard Anthony Nielson.(Lopez, K) Modified on 12/6/2023 (Woodson, A).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Richard Anthony Nielson. (Lopez, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Nielson v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Anthony Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?