(HC) Meza v. St. Andre
Petitioner: Joaquin Meza
Respondent: R. St. Andre
Case Number: 2:2023cv02748
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 OPPOSITION by Joaquin Meza to #24 Motion to Dismiss. (Murphy, J)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to DISMISS by R. St. Andre. (Harper, Yun Hwa)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Harper, Yun Hwa)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-02748 DAD KJN. (Murphy, J)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 22 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Joaquin Meza. (Murphy, J)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition served on Tami Krenzin pursuant to #18 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Spichka, K.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/04/2023. Consent or Decline due by 1/8/2024. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Spichka, K.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/04/2023 GRANTING the #3 , #8 & #9 Motions to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 30 days. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 2/5/2024. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Spichka, K.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Joaquin Meza. (Spichka, K.)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on Joaquin Meza to updated P.O. Box. (Spichka, K.)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:23-cv-03912.
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Joaquin Meza. (Maldonado, C)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of this Order was mailed to Petitioner [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***Please Disregard - See #15 AMENDED ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2023) Modified on 11/22/2023 (crr, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Joaquin Meza. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joaquin Meza.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joaquin Meza. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joaquin Meza. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Joaquin Meza. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Added post office box to petitioner's address and remailed notices #5 , #6 to petitioner at KVSP.(ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/11/2023. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PLEASE DISREGARD these instructions sent to CDCR in error. - The Clerk has received plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is directed to submit within 72 hours and in PDF form a certified Prison Trust Account statement for the plaintiff, Joaquin Meza G09102, reflecting the last six months activity, to cdcrfilings@cand.uscourts.gov. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 8/4/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/7/2023 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joaquin Meza. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE DISREGARD; clerical error. See corrected filing at Docket no. #3 (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023) Modified on 8/4/2023 (anj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/7/2023 (ljf, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Joaquin Meza. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2023) [Transferred from cand on 11/27/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Meza v. St. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joaquin Meza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. St. Andre
Represented By: Yun Hwa Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?