Moms for Liberty - Yolo County et al v. Yolo County et al
Plaintiff: Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Independent Council on Womens Sports, California Family Council, Elisabeth Y. Bourne, Allison L. Snyder, Sophia Lorey, Kim Jones and Clare Erin Friday
Defendant: Yolo County, Diana Lopez and D. Scott Love
Case Number: 2:2023cv02802
Filed: December 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 02/01/24 EXTENDING time for Defendants County of Yolo, Diana Lopez and D. Scott Love to respond to complaint by 02/19/24. (Benson, A.)
January 31, 2024 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Diana Lopez, D. Scott Love, Yolo County. Attorney Warner, Serena M. added. (Warner, Serena) Modified on 2/1/2024 (Benson, A.).
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/23 GRANTING #12 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Elisabeth Y. Bourne,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for California Family Council,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Clare Erin Friday,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Independent Council on Womens Sports,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Kim Jones,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Sophia Lorey,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Moms for Liberty - Yolo County,Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV for Allison L. Snyder. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/14/2023 GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added Attorney Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV for Elisabeth Y. Bourne, California Family Council, Clare Erin Friday, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Kim Jones, Sophia Lorey, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, and Allison L. Snyder. The Pro Hac Vice Attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Lopez, K)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Elisabeth Y. Bourne, California Family Council, Clare Erin Friday, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Kim Jones, Sophia Lorey, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Allison L. Snyder for attorney Tyson C. Langhofer to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-11241875) (Kiefer, Christiana)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Clemente Licea, O)
December 13, 2023 Filing 10 [DISREGARD - SEE #11 ] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Clemente Licea, O) Modified on 12/13/2023 (Clemente Licea, O).
December 13, 2023 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-02802 WBS CKD. (Clemente Licea, O)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Elisabeth Y. Bourne, California Family Council, Clare Erin Friday, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Kim Jones, Sophia Lorey, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Allison L. Snyder re #3 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider, #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons, #4 Notice of Appearance, #6 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order submitted by Elisabeth Y. Bourne, California Family Council, Clare Erin Friday, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Kim Jones, Sophia Lorey, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Allison L. Snyder for attorney M. (Kiefer, Christiana) Modified on 12/12/2023 (Licea Chavez, V).
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to All Defendants (Kiefer, Christiana)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Elisabeth Y. Bourne, California Family Council, Clare Erin Friday, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Kim Jones, Sophia Lorey, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Allison L. Snyder for attorney Mathew W. Hoffmann to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-11222170) (Kiefer, Christiana)
December 5, 2023 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Gura, Alan)
December 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alan Gura on behalf of Elisabeth Y. Bourne, California Family Council, Clare Erin Friday, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Kim Jones, Sophia Lorey, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Allison L. Snyder. Attorney Gura, Alan added. (Gura, Alan)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
December 4, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Diana Lopez, D. Scott Love, Yolo County* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Christiana M. Kiefer* *Alliance Defending Freedom* *440 1st Street NW Suite 600* *Washington, DC 20001*. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Sophia Lorey, California Family Council, Kim Jones, Independent Council on Womens Sports, Clare Erin Friday, Elisabeth Y. Bourne, Moms for Liberty - Yolo County, Allison L. Snyder. Attorney Kiefer, Christiana M. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11220498) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiefer, Christiana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moms for Liberty - Yolo County et al v. Yolo County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moms for Liberty - Yolo County
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Council on Womens Sports
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Family Council
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Y. Bourne
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison L. Snyder
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Lorey
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Jones
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clare Erin Friday
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Christiana M. Kiefer
Represented By: Mathew W. Hoffmann, PHV
Represented By: Tyson C. Langhofer, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolo County
Represented By: Serena M. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Lopez
Represented By: Serena M. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Love
Represented By: Serena M. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?