(PC) Hicks v. Kahlon et al
Plaintiff: Michael James Hicks
Defendant: P. Kahlon and S. Gates
Case Number: 2:2023cv02830
Filed: December 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Michael James Hicks. (Lopez, K)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-02830 KJM CKD. (Murphy, J)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 6 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Michael James Hicks. (Murphy, J)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Michael James Hicks. (Nair, C)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Michael James Hicks, CDCR No. B-80852 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Spichka, K.)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *12/5/2023*. Consent or Decline due by 1/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Woodson, A)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael James Hicks. (Woodson, A)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael James Hicks. (Woodson, A)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against S. Gates, P. Kahlon by Michael James Hicks. (Additional attachment(s) #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woodson, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hicks v. Kahlon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Kahlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?