(PS) Lopez v. Kandola
Plaintiff: Mirna Lopez
Defendant: Akashdeep Kandola
Case Number: 2:2023cv02856
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 11 MINUTES FOR HEARING held before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 1/19/2024. Plaintiff, M. Lopez, appeared pro se. B. Hansen appeared for Defendant. The Court DISSOLVED the Temporary Restraining Order filed in Sacramento County Superior Court. (cc: Operations Supervisor) Court Reporter: M. Valenoti. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS by Akashdeep Kandola. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Akashdeep Singh Kandola, #3 Certification of Federal Employment, #4 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #5 Proof of Service)(Hansen, Brendon)
January 19, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Minutes for Hearing served on Mirna Lopez. (Michel, G.)
January 8, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Akashdeep Kandola to [ 4 ] Minute Order, #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Akashdeep Singh Kandola, #2 Certification of Federal Employment, #3 App'x of Unpublished Cases, #4 Proof of Service by Mail, #5 Proof of Service by Email)(Hansen, Brendon) Modified on 1/9/2024 (Reader, L).
January 5, 2024 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 1/5/2024: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #6 , as filed, is defective. Defendant shall comply with Local Rule 302(c)(1) and re-notice the motion for hearing before the assigned Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the hearing set for 1/18/2024 is VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
January 5, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Akashdeep Kandola re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Hansen, Brendon) Modified on 1/9/2024 (Reader, L).
January 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Akashdeep Kandola. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (DJC) before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Akashdeep Singh Kandola, #3 Certification of Federal Employment, #4 Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #5 Proof of Service)(Hansen, Brendon)
January 5, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Mirna López. (Michel, G.)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/12/23 GRANTING #3 Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for a Temporary Restraining Order Against Defendant. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Request by 1/12/24. (Kastilahn, A)
December 12, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Mirna Lopez. (Kastilahn, A)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 12/8/2023: For present purposes the Court will construe the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order filed in Sacramento County Superior Court (ECF No. #1 at 6-15.) as a complaint. The Court notes that the Superior Court granted a temporary restraining order pending a hearing on Plaintiff's request for a restraining order. (ECF No. #1 at 24-26.) Defendant now requests an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's request for a restraining order. (ECF No. #3 .) Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. Defendant will have until January 5, 2024 to file a response to Plaintiff's request, which the Court has construed as a complaint. Plaintiff will be have until January 12, 2024 to file any reply to Defendant's response. This matter is SET for hearing on January 18, 2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta. The Superior Court's order remains in effect pending a hearing on the request or a motion to dissolve that order. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Michel, G.)
December 8, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Minute Order served on Mirna Lopez. (Michel, G.)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Akashdeep Kandola for to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Request for a Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Hansen, Brendon)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 23CH001332 by Akashdeep Kandola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Hansen, Brendon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Lopez v. Kandola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akashdeep Kandola
Represented By: Brendon Laurs Steffan Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?