(PC) Nelson v. The People of California et al
Plaintiff: Warren Andrew Nelson
Defendant: The People of California, Rowe, Wang and Decker
Case Number: 2:2023cv02935
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/6/24 ORDERING that within 21 days of the filing of this order, plaintiff shall submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without further warning. (Kastilahn, A)
February 6, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on Warren Andrew Nelson. (Kastilahn, A)
January 2, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nair, C)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/2023 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $402 within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
December 20, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order and IFP Application served on Warren Andrew Nelson. (Spichka, K.)
December 18, 2023 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 1/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lawrence, A)
December 18, 2023 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:23-cv-06072.
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk of the Court shall transfer the case forthwith. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/18/2023. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/18/2023.]
December 18, 2023 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Warren Andrew Nelson. (Lawrence, A)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 Letter from Warren Andrew Nelson. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2023) [Transferred from cand on 12/18/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/18/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/2/2024. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 12/18/2023.]
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Decker, Rowe, The People of California, Wang. Filed by Warren Andrew Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2023) [Transferred from cand on 12/18/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Nelson v. The People of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?