(PC) Kutterer v. Facility Wellpath Medical et al
Plaintiff: Marcus Kutterer
Defendant: Facility Wellpath Medical, Nigara, Wong and Legal Mail Officer
Case Number: 2:2023cv02970
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/2024 ORDERING the Clerk to appoint a district judge to this action and recommending that plaintiff's request for #1 , #8 injunctive relief, made in the original and amended complaints, for treatment for his injured leg be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Inmate Trust Account of Marcus Kutterer signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/2024.The appropriate agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's ifp on the Sheriff of Solano County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/2024 GRANTING plaintiff's #9 request to proceed ifp and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with the concurrent order.(Yin, K)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 , #11 Orders, #12 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Marcus Kutterer. Copy of #11 Order and ifp served on the Sheriff of Solano County. (Yin, K)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marcus Kutterer. (Woodson, A)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT [Marked as original] against All Defendants by Marcus Kutterer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woodson, A)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/22/2024 ORDERING within 5 days, plaintiff shall file a status report addressing whether he has received treatment for the leg injury described in his complaint. (Yin, K)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Marcus Kutterer. (Yin, K)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/04/2023 DIRECTING Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief within 10 days from the date of this order. (Spichka, K.)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on Marcus Kutterer. #5 Order and copy of #1 Complaint served and faxed on Solano County Counsel. #5 Order and copy of #1 Complaint served on Facility Wellpath Medical and Dr. Nigara. (Spichka, K.)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/03/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $405 within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP Application served on Marcus Kutterer. (Spichka, K.)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Woodson, A)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Marcus Kutterer. (Woodson, A)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INMATE BALANCE HISTORY REPORT by Marcus Kutterer. (Woodson, A)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Facility Wellpath Medical, Legal Mail Officer, Nigara, Wong by Marcus Kutterer. (Woodson, A) #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woodson, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Kutterer v. Facility Wellpath Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Kutterer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facility Wellpath Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nigara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Mail Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?