(PC) Pangborn v. Strong et al
Plaintiff: David James Pangborn
Defendant: Strong, Andrichuk, Jian Ma, Jeff Lynch, CDCR, McDonald, Williams and Peterson
Case Number: 2:2023cv02976
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/26/2024 DISMISSING the #6 Amended Complaint with 30 days to file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants are not required to respond to the Second Amended Complaint until ordered by the Court. (Lopez, K)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on David James Pangborn. (Lopez, K)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by David James Pangborn. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Amendment) (Woodson, A)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/12/2024 GRANTING defendants' #4 request for the court to screen plaintiff's complaint and DISMISSING plaintiff's complaint. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the Notice of Amendment with the required documents. (Yin, K)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order served on David James Pangborn. (Yin, K)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Screening Under the Prison Litigation Reform Act by Andrichuk, et al. (Kallberg, Jacqueline) Modified on 1/3/2024 (Spichka, K.).
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AMENDED NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 23CV008249 by David James Pangborn. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kallberg, Jacqueline)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior, case number 23CV008249 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11253466) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kallberg, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Pangborn v. Strong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David James Pangborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrichuk
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Ma
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Lynch
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterson
Represented By: Jacqueline Kallberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?