Hudson Ins. Co v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Co.
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv03026
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company on 1/26/2024, Answer due 3/26/2024 (Enger, William)
January 26, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company by Hudson Insurance Company.(Enger, William)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Travelers Casualty and Surety Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William K. Enger* *Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker* *555 South Flower Street Suite 2900* *Los Angeles, CA 90017*. (Licea Chavez, V)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Casualty and Surety Company by Hudson Insurance Company. Attorney Enger, William K. added. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11261607) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Enger, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Ins. Co v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: William K. Enger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?