United States of America v. Approximately $22,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $22,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency and Approximately $9,970.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Jamal Christopher Spratling
Case Number: 2:2023mc00423
Filed: December 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2024 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/19/2024 EXTENDING the deadline to 2/20/24 by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture. (Clemente Licea, O)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/21/23 EXTENDING the deadline to 1/19/24 by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture. (Kastilahn, A)
December 20, 2023 Filing 1 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khasigian, Kevin)
December 20, 2023 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Forfeiture. (Reader, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $22,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $22,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $18,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $9,970.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jamal Christopher Spratling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?