(PC) Mack v. Director of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Mack
Defendant: Director of Corrections, S. M. Rios, Xavier Bercerra, Ralph M. Diaz, Scott Kernan, Marion Spearman, D. Wattree, J. Hightower, J. Duccassee and A. Munoz
Case Number: 2:2024cv00010
Filed: January 2, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 02/27/2024 GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the service of this Order in which to file a Complaint and submit an application to proceed IFP. (Nair, C)
February 28, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order served on Anthony E. Mack. (Nair, C)
February 22, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File a Complaint and IFP Form by Anthony E. Mack. (Nair, C)
February 13, 2024 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-00010 DJC AC. (Murphy, J)
February 13, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Anthony E. Mack. (Murphy, J)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/10/2024 DIRECTING Plaintiff to file a Complaint that complies with the requirements of the Civil Rights Act, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure,and the Local Rules of Practice and to submit an IFP Application or pay the appropriate filing fee within 30 days from the date of this Order. (Lopez, K)
January 11, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, Civil Rights Complaint, and IFP Application served on Anthony E. Mack. (Lopez, K)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 2/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lopez, K)
January 4, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Anthony E. Mack. (Lopez, K)
January 2, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Xavier Bercerra, Ralph M. Diaz, Director of Corrections, J. Duccassee, J. Hightower, Scott Kernan, A. Munoz, S. M. Rios, Marion Spearman, D. Wattree by Anthony E. Mack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Mack v. Director of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony E. Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. M. Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Bercerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Wattree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Duccassee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?