(SS)(PS) Schoppe-Escobar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Vielka A. Schoppe-Escobar
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2024cv00142
Filed: January 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/7/2024: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:24-cv-00142-AC. (Nair, C)
February 5, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Nair, C)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) . [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
January 29, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Vielka A. Schoppe-Escobar* *77 Higdon Rd.* *P.O. Box 334* *West Point, CA 95255*. . [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 01/26/24 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING E-Service on the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk shall issue a summons and serve this order, summons, complaint and Scheduling Order on the Commissioner of Social Security. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement] (Benson, A.)
January 29, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, #7 Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider, #6 Summons, served on Vielka A. Schoppe-Escobar. (Benson, A.) Modified on 1/29/2024 (Benson, A.).
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Vieira, Christopher)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Christopher Vieira for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Social Security Admin- SS E-Service and US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service terminated (Vieira, Christopher)
January 12, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lopez, K)
January 11, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Vielka A. Schoppe-Escobar. (Lopez, K)
January 11, 2024 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Vielka A. Schoppe-Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lopez, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS)(PS) Schoppe-Escobar v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vielka A. Schoppe-Escobar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- SS E-Service
Represented By: Social Security Admin- SS E-Service
Represented By: Christopher Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?