(PS) Bledsoe v. Jacot et al
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Defendant: Katy Jacot, Mark E. Thiel, Pearlie Bledsoe Townes and Superior Court of California County of San Joaquin
Case Number: 2:2024cv00451
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to STAY on Bench Trial by Donnell Bledsoe. (Woodson, A)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to STAY on Bench Trial by Donnell Bledsoe. (Murphy, J)
February 13, 2024 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-00451 DAD AC. (Murphy, J)
February 13, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 3 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Donnell Bledsoe. (Murphy, J)
February 13, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Murphy, J)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Donnell Bledsoe. (Murphy, J) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/13/2024) (Murphy, J).
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katy Jacot, Superior Court of California County of San Joaquin, Mark E. Thiel, Pearlie Bledsoe Townes by Donnell Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, J) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/13/2024) (Murphy, J). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/13/2024) (Murphy, J).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Bledsoe v. Jacot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katy Jacot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearlie Bledsoe Townes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Court of California County of San Joaquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?