Espinoza v. Goodleap, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Loera Espinoza
Defendant: Goodleap, LLC., Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00465
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 17 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to 05/06/2024 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Goodleap, LLC. Attorney Levin, Fredrick S. added. (Levin, Fredrick) Modified on 4/8/2024 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 4, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Goodleap, LLC. served on 3/18/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Marchiando, Craig)
April 3, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Trans Union, LLC. served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/26/2024. (Marchiando, Craig)
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 3/18/2024, answer due 4/8/2024. (Marchiando, Craig)
April 3, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 3/15/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Marchiando, Craig)
April 2, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Herron, Thomas)
April 2, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME to 05/03/2024 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Attorney Herron, Thomas J. added. (Herron, Thomas)
April 1, 2024 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by M York Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/01/2024 GRANTING unopposed #8 motion and EXTENDING, to 04/26/2024, Defendant Trans Union, LLC's Answer to #1 Complaint. (York, M)
April 1, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Trans Union, LLC.. (Singh, Ritika)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to File Answer by Trans Union, LLC. Attorney Singh, Ritika added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singh, Ritika) Modified on 4/2/2024 (Benson, A.).
April 1, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by M York Courtroom Deputy for Senior District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/01/2024 APPROVING #6 Stipulation and EXTENDING, to 05/03/2024, Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's Answer to #1 Complaint. (York, M)
April 1, 2024 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time to respond to initial complaint by not more than 28 days by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hodsden, Alice)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Hodsden, Alice)
April 1, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Alice Hodsden on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Hodsden, Alice added. (Hodsden, Alice)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Licea Chavez, V)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Goodleap, LLC., Trans Union, LLC.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig Carley Marchiando* *Consumer Litigation Associates* *763 J. Clyde Morris Blvd. Suite 1-A* *Newport News, VA 23601*. (Licea Chavez, V)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Goodleap, LLC., Trans Union, LLC. by Jorge Loera Espinoza. Attorney Marchiando, Craig Carley added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11347268) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marchiando, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. Goodleap, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Loera Espinoza
Represented By: Craig Carley Marchiando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodleap, LLC.
Represented By: Fredrick S. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC.
Represented By: Ritika Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Alice Hodsden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?