(HC) Kalso v. Butte County Superior Court
Petitioner: Zachary Lloyd Kalso
Respondent: Butte County Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2024cv00507
Filed: February 21, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion re-served on Zachary Lloyd Kalso at 1461 Eaton Road. (Yin, K)
April 3, 2024 PETITIONER'S ADDRESS UPDATED to 1461 Eaton Rd., Chico, CA 95973 pursuant to notice filed on 3/28/2024 in case 2:24-cv-0653. (Yin, K)
April 1, 2024 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Not in Custody: #6 Order sent to Zachary Kalso. Notice of Change of Address due by 6/10/2024. (Kyono, V)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 03/19/2024 GRANTING #5 Motion to Proceed IFP. (Nair, C)
March 20, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, served on Zachary Lloyd Kalso. (Nair, C)
March 11, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Zachary Lloyd Kalso. (Kyono, V)
February 29, 2024 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 02/28/2024 DIRECTING Petitioner to File a Motion for IFP within 30 days or pay the appropriate filing fee from the date of this Order. (Nair, C)
February 29, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order & IFP Application served on Zachary Lloyd Kalso. (Nair, C)
February 21, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Zachary Lloyd Kalso. (Kyono, Valerie)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 3/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Kyono, Valerie)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Butte County Superior Court by Zachary Lloyd Kalso.(Kyono, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Kalso v. Butte County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zachary Lloyd Kalso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Butte County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?