(PS) Oliver v. DDS Legal Support Systems Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Defendant: DDS Legal Support Systems Inc., Eddings Attorney Support Services Inc., Cal West Attorney Services Inc., Bay Area File L.L.C., Win-Win ALSSI, Inc., Legal Visit, Inc., True Legal Support, Inc., USA Express Legal & Investigative Services, Inc., USA Express, Inc., Nationwide Legal Support, Inc., Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc., All-N-One Legal Support, Inc., Advanced Microsystems Group, Inc., Legal Document Server, Inc., BFRM Legal Support Services, Signal Attorney Service, Inc., Discovery Legal Retrieval and Process Service, LLC., SERVEPRO-Legal, Laguna Legal, Inc. and Sables Servco, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv00514
Filed: February 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 24 ANSWER by Discovery Legal Retrieval and Process Service, LLC.. Attorney Blozan, Leslie A. added.(Blozan, Leslie)
April 15, 2024 Filing 23 ANSWER by USA Express, Inc.. Attorney Blozan, Leslie A. added.(Blozan, Leslie)
April 12, 2024 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BFRM Legal Support Services by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Legal Document Server, Inc. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to All-N-One Legal Support, Inc. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Signal Attorney Service, Inc. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to True Legal Support, Inc. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Cal West Attorney Services Inc. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Discovery Legal Retrieval and Process Service, LLC. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to SHORTEN TIME for Court Ruling by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Advanced Microsystems Group, Inc., with Prejudice by Anthony Oliver. (Murphy, J)
April 12, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER by Cal West Attorney Services Inc.. Attorney Salem, Edmond E. added.(Salem, Edmond)
April 11, 2024 Filing 17 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Legal Visit, Inc.* (Donati, J)
April 11, 2024 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Nationwide Legal Support, Inc, USA Express Legal & Investigative Services, Inc, USA Express, Inc, Win-Win ALSSI, Inc. The clerk hereby declines to enter #12 Request for Entry of Default, filed by Anthony Oliver due to not able to determine with documents provided whether Agent for Service was served with Complaint. (TEXT ONLY) (Donati, J)
April 11, 2024 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT DECLINED as to Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc.. The clerk hereby declines to enter #12 Request for Entry of Default, filed by Anthony Oliver due to an #11 Answer being filed by Defendant. (TEXT ONLY) (Donati, J)
April 11, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: 15 & 16 Clerk's Declines of Entry of Default, and #17 Clerk's Entry of Default served on Anthony Oliver. (Donati, J)
April 10, 2024 Filing 14 STIPULATION to EXTEND Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Legal Document Server, Inc. Attorney Taylor, Brett N. added. (Taylor, Brett) Modified on 4/11/2024 (Nair, C).
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Anthony Oliver re #12 Request for Entry of Default. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Advanced Microsystems Group, Inc., #2 Proof of Service BFRM Legal Support Services, #3 Proof of Service True Legal Support, Inc.) (Murphy, J)
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to USA Express Legal & Investigative Services Inc., Legal Visit Inc., Nationwide Legal Support Inc., Pacific Coast Legal Services Inc., USA Express Inc., Win-Win ALSSI Inc., by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Legal Visit, Inc., #2 Nationwide Legal Support Inc., #3 USA Express Inc., #4 Win-Win ALSSI Inc., #5 Pacific Coast Legal Services Inc.) (Murphy, J)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc.. Attorney Hugo, Edward added.(Hugo, Edward)
March 22, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Cal West Attorney Services Inc. served on 3/18/2024, Legal Visit, Inc. served on 3/18/2024, Nationwide Legal Support, Inc. served on 3/18/2024, Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc. served on 3/18/2024, USA Express Legal & Investigative Services, Inc. served on 3/18/2024, USA Express, Inc. served on 3/18/2024, Win-Win ALSSI, Inc. served on 3/18/2024. (Woodson, A)
February 29, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Summons, served on Anthony Oliver. (Murphy, J)
February 28, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Advanced Microsystems Group, Inc., All-N-One Legal Support, Inc., BFRM Legal Support Services, Discovery Legal Retrieval and Process Service, LLC., Laguna Legal, Inc., Legal Document Server, Inc., Legal Visit, Inc., Nationwide Legal Support, Inc., Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc., SERVEPRO-Legal, Sables Servco, LLC, Signal Attorney Service, Inc., True Legal Support, Inc., USA Express Legal & Investigative Services, Inc., USA Express, Inc., Win-Win ALSSI, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Oliver* *1978 GA Highway 147* *Reidsville, GA 30453*. (Murphy, J)
February 28, 2024 Filing 8 [DISREGARD - TO BE REISSUED] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Advanced Microsystems Group, Inc., All-N-One Legal Support, Inc., BFRM Legal Support Services, Discovery Legal Retrieval and Process Service, LLC., Laguna Legal, Inc., Legal Document Server, Inc., Legal Visit, Inc., Nationwide Legal Support, Inc., Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc., SERVEPRO-Legal, Sables Servco, LLC, Signal Attorney Service, Inc., True Legal Support, Inc., USA Express Legal & Investigative Services, Inc., USA Express, Inc., Win-Win ALSSI, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. (Murphy, J) Modified on 2/29/2024 (Benson, A.).
February 28, 2024 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Anthony Oliver.(Murphy, J)
February 28, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anthony Oliver. (Murphy, J)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to FILE ELECTRONICALLY by Anthony Oliver. (Murphy, J)
February 22, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Informational Order) (Woodson, A)
February 22, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bay Area File L.L.C., Cal West Attorney Services Inc., DDS Legal Support Systems Inc., Eddings Attorney Support Services Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony Oliver* *1978 GA Highway 147* *Reidsville, GA 30453*. (Woodson, A)
February 22, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Summons, #4 Civil New Case Documents for KJM served on Anthony Oliver. (Woodson, A)
February 20, 2024 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
February 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bay Area File L.L.C., Cal West Attorney Services Inc., DDS Legal Support Systems Inc., Eddings Attorney Support Services Inc. by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Proposed Summons) (Woodson, A)
February 20, 2024 RECEIPT number 200005702 in the amount of $405.00 for Civil Filing Fee. (Woodson, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Oliver v. DDS Legal Support Systems Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDS Legal Support Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddings Attorney Support Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal West Attorney Services Inc.
Represented By: Edmond E. Salem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Area File L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Win-Win ALSSI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Visit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Legal Support, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Express Legal & Investigative Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Express, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie A. Blozan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Legal Support, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Coast Legal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All-N-One Legal Support, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Microsystems Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Document Server, Inc.
Represented By: Brett N. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFRM Legal Support Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signal Attorney Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discovery Legal Retrieval and Process Service, LLC.
Represented By: Leslie A. Blozan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVEPRO-Legal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laguna Legal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sables Servco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?