(PC) Fiorito v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Michael Fiorito
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2024cv00990
Filed: April 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Michael Fiorito. (Murphy, J)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Correct Record re #3 Order by Michael Fiorito. (Murphy, J)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION Injunctive Relief by Michael Fiorito. (Murphy, J)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/07/2024 DIRECTING the Plaintiff to submit a Motion to Proceed IFP or the required fees in the amount of $405 within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and IFP Application served on Michael Fiorito. (Spichka, K.)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 5/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Nair, C)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Michael Fiorito. (Nair, C)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against United States of America by Michael Fiorito. (Nair, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fiorito v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fiorito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?