Fox v. Genworth Life and Annuity Ins. Co.
Plaintiff: James Fox
Defendant: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01001
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company.(Duvall, Michael) Modified on 5/9/2024 (Woodson, A).
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 5/3/2024 GRANTING #14 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Haley Eastham, PHV for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Clemente Licea, O)
May 2, 2024 Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company for attorney Haley Eastham to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11503078) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Cert., #2 Proof of Service)(Duvall, Michael)
May 2, 2024 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 5/2/2024 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Sandra D. Hauser, PHV for Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Woodson, A)
May 1, 2024 Filing 12 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 9/9/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 1, 2024 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Senior District Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-01001-WBS-CKD. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Tomasevic, Alex)
April 17, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Duvall, Michael)
April 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Dale Ball on behalf of James Fox. Attorney Ball, Sarah Dale added. (Ball, Sarah)
April 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jack B. Winters, Jr on behalf of James Fox. Attorney Winters, Jack B. added. (Winters, Jack)
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
April 3, 2024 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-11445527) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proof of Service)(Duvall, Michael)
April 3, 2024 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Defendant Genworth's Time to Respond to Complaint by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael)
April 3, 2024 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Initial Disclosures. (Duvall, Michael)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Duvall, Michael)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV003505 by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11444907) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Duvall, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. Genworth Life and Annuity Ins. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fox
Represented By: Sarah Dale Ball
Represented By: Alex Tomasevic
Represented By: Craig M. Nicholas
Represented By: Jack B. Winters, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Duvall
Represented By: Haley Eastham, PHV
Represented By: Sandra D. Hauser, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?