(PC) DePonte v. Bowman, et al.
Plaintiff: David Arthur DePonte
Defendant: Jessica Bowman and Daniel Queava
Case Number: 2:2024cv01262
Filed: April 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Chi Soo Kim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against defendants by David Arthur DePonte. (Kyono, V)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Amendment by David Arthur DePonte (Kyono, V)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE re Mail by David Arthur DePonte (Kyono, V)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for ORDER to Stop Legal Interference by David Arthur DePonte. (Murphy, J)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for ORDER to Retrieve Legal Documents by David Arthur DePonte. (Murphy, J)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 6/5/2024 DISMISSING #24 Amended Complaint and DENYING #26 Motion for Discovery. Second Amended Complaint due within 30 days from the date of this order. (Kyono, V)
June 6, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #27 Order served on David Arthur DePonte. (Kyono, V)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION For Discovery by David Arthur DePonte. (Kyono, V)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Murphy, J)
May 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Jessica Bowman by David Arthur DePonte. (Murphy, J)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta and Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-1262 DJC CSK. (Woodson, A)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 23 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on David Arthur DePonte. (Woodson, A)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Woodson, A)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 EXHIBIT with Letter by David Arthur DePonte. (Woodson, A)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Copy of IFP served on CDCR pursuant to #19 Order Directing Prisoner Payment. (Spichka, K.)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 05/07/2024 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of David Arthur DePonte. The Clerk to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's in forma pauperis application on CDCR. (cc: Financial, CDCR) (Spichka, K.)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Chi Soo Kim on 05/07/2024 GRANTING the #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, GRANTING the #9 Motion to Place More than 25 Documents on the Record and DISMISSING the #1 Complaint. Notice of Amendment and Amended Complaint due within 30 days. (Spichka, K.)
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order and #19 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on David Arthur DePonte. (Spichka, K.)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REQUEST FOR COPIES by David Arthur DePonte. (Murphy, J) [Response sent with a one-time only copy of the docket and copy/status procedures.] Modified on 5/9/2024 (Yin, K).
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order and #15 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on David Arthur DePonte at CSATF per address listed on plaintiff's documents. (Spichka, K.)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by David Arthur DePonte. (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER transferring case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/30/2024. (Lundstrom, T)
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order, #15 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Arthur DePonte. (Lundstrom, T)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/3/2024. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for David Arthur DePonte, CDCR No. T-43638 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Lundstrom, T)
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:24-cv-01414.
April 29, 2024 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on David Arthur DePonte. (Lundstrom, T)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/26/2024. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Place More Than 25 Documents on Record filed by David Arthur DePonte. Responses due by 5/23/2024. Replies due by 6/6/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2024) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.].
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/23/24. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Mailed copy of docket sheet to plaintiff at CSATF/CSP-COR via CAND's outgoing mail folder. (ljf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2024) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Letter from David A. DePonte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2024) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/15/2024. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2024)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Arthur DePonte. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2024) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessica Bowman, Daniel Queava. Filed by David Arthur DePonte. Consent/Declination due by 4/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2024) [Transferred from cand on 4/29/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) DePonte v. Bowman, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arthur DePonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Queava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?