Rabo Agrifinance, LLC v. Pamma et al
Plaintiff: Rabo Agrifinance, LLC
Defendant: May Avenue Investments, VCRAF Agis California Nuts, LLC, Sukhraj Pamma, Jaismin Pamma, Shinda Upple, Ajmail Sangha, Imperial Orchards and Sutter Buttes Mercantile, LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01392
Filed: May 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Rabo Agrifinance, LLC served on 6/29/2024, answer due 7/22/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
July 9, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER by VCRAF Agis California Nuts, LLC. Attorney Zolezzi, Jeanne M. added. (Zolezzi, Jeanne)
June 28, 2024 Filing 13 STIPULATION To Extend Time for Defendants VCRAF AGIS California Nuts, LLC to Answer Complaint by Rabo Agrifinance, LLC. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 27, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER by Imperial Orchards, Jaismin Pamma, Sukhraj Pamma, Ajmail Sangha, Sutter Buttes Mercantile, LLC, Shinda Upple. Attorney Given, Bernard R. added. (Given, Bernard)
June 25, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Shinda Upple served on 6/5/2024, answer due 6/26/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 25, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Imperial Orchards served on 5/23/2024, answer due 6/13/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 25, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sukhraj Pamma served on 5/26/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 25, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: VCRAF Agis California Nuts, LLC served on 5/23/2024, answer due 6/13/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 25, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ajmail Sangha served on 5/24/2024, answer due 6/14/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 25, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sutter Buttes Mercantile, LLC served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 25, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jaismin Pamma served on 5/26/2024, answer due 6/17/2024. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
June 17, 2024 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by Rabo Agrifinance, LLC. (Paloutzian, Dirk)
May 16, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
May 16, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Imperial Orchards, May Avenue Investments, Jaismin Pamma, Sukhraj Pamma, Ajmail Sangha, Sutter Buttes Mercantile, LLC, Shinda Upple, VCRAF Agis California Nuts, LLC * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Dirk B. Paloutzian* *Baker Manock & Jensen, PC* *5260 N. Palm Ave., Suite 201* *Fresno, CA 93704*. (Benson, A.)
May 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Rabo Agrifinance, LLC. Attorney Paloutzian, Dirk B. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11527090) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - Z, #2 Exhibits AA-TT, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paloutzian, Dirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabo Agrifinance, LLC v. Pamma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rabo Agrifinance, LLC
Represented By: Dirk B. Paloutzian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Avenue Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VCRAF Agis California Nuts, LLC
Represented By: Jeanne M. Zolezzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhraj Pamma
Represented By: Bernard R. Given, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaismin Pamma
Represented By: Bernard R. Given, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shinda Upple
Represented By: Bernard R. Given, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajmail Sangha
Represented By: Bernard R. Given, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial Orchards
Represented By: Bernard R. Given, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Buttes Mercantile, LLC
Represented By: Bernard R. Given, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?