(PS) Chiu v. Iu Mien Church et al
Plaintiff: Taifusin Chiu
Defendant: Donald Trump and Iu Mien Church
Case Number: 2:2024cv01412
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Chi Soo Kim
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Taifusin Chiu on 7/11/2024. (Murphy, J)
June 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE re Medal of Honor by Taifusin Chiu. (Murphy, J)
June 3, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE re Waiver of Service of Summons by Taifusin Chiu (Kyono, V)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in SUPPORT OF #1 Complaint filed by Taifusin Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Murphy, J)
May 20, 2024 SERVICE BY MAIL: IFP Application served on Taifusin Chiu. (Murphy, J)
May 20, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Murphy, J)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Taifusin Chiu. (Murphy, J)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iu Mien Church, Donald Trump by Taifusin Chiu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Murphy, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Chiu v. Iu Mien Church et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iu Mien Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taifusin Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?