(SS) McVey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Chelsea Rose McVey
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2024cv01418
Filed: May 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2024 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Voluntary Remand to the Agency re #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Martin, Justin)
July 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT IN ELECTRONIC FORMAT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Olsen, Edward Alan added. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #4 Payment Documents, #5 Jurisdictional Documents, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3) (Olsen, Edward)
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/31/2024: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 2:24-cv-1418 AC (SS).(Licea Chavez, V)
May 30, 2024 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Gerrard, Josephine)
May 30, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin, Justin)
May 30, 2024 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Justin Lane Martin, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security (Martin, Justin)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 8/23/2024. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Josephine Mary Gerrard* *Gerrard Law Offices* *1791 Solano Avenue, Suite F01* *Berkeley, CA 94707*. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/22/2024 GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a summons for this case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue a scheduling order in this case. [Served by Clerk on Commissioner via E-Service Agreement]. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 20, 2024 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Benson, A.)
May 17, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Chelsea McVey. (Gerrard, Josephine)
May 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Chelsea McVey. Attorney Gerrard, Josephine Mary added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gerrard, Josephine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) McVey v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Edward Alan Olsen, GOVT
Represented By: Justin Lane Martin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Rose McVey
Represented By: Josephine Mary Gerrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?