Gastelum v. Butte County, et al.,
Plaintiff: Cesar Gastelum
Defendant: Patrick McNelis, Butte County and Tristan Harper
Case Number: 2:2024cv01425
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 7/10/24 SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference for 8/7/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. On or before 7/31/24, the parties shall file with the Court a joint scheduling conference statement. (Kastilahn, A)
July 8, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Butte County, Tristan Harper, Patrick McNelis. Attorney Camy, William E. added. (Camy, William)
June 10, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Cesar Gastelum served on 5/29/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Manuel, Joseph) Modified on 6/13/2024 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy R. Alvarez for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/21/2024: ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 09/26/2024 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry) (Alvarez, R.)
May 20, 2024 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Nair, C)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Butte County, Tristan Harper, Patrick McNelis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph David Manuel* *Law Office of Joseph David Manuel* *180 Promenade Circle, Ste 300* *Sacramento, CA 95834*. (Nair, C)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Cesar Gastelum. Attorney Manuel, Joseph David added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manuel, Joseph)
May 20, 2024 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11534039. (Manuel, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gastelum v. Butte County, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick McNelis
Represented By: William E. Camy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County
Represented By: William E. Camy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tristan Harper
Represented By: William E. Camy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Gastelum
Represented By: Joseph David Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?