Slaughter v. City of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Lawrence Slaughter
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2024cv01757
Filed: June 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sean C Riordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2024 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Richmond, Sean)
August 7, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand by City of Sacramento. Attorney Richmond, Sean D. added. (Richmond, Sean)
August 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes to Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan for all further proceedings. (Mendez Licea, O)
June 24, 2024 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.)
June 24, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Sacramento* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John L. Burris* *Law Offices of John L. Burris* *7677 Oakport St., Suite 1120* *Oakland, CA 94621*. (Benson, A.)
June 21, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James A. Cook on behalf of Lawrence Slaughter. Attorney Cook, James A. added. (Cook, James)
June 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lawrence Slaughter. Attorney Burris, John L. added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11594886) (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Burris, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. City of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Sean D. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Slaughter
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: James A. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?