USA v. Approx. $6,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $6,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Daniel Paiz
Case Number: 2:2024mc00012
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Calabretta
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 03/04/2024 EXTENDING the deadline for the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture to 06/10/2024. (Lopez, K)
March 4, 2024 Filing 3 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. (Khasigian, Kevin)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 1/10/2024 EXTENDING the deadline for the United States to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictmentalleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture to 3/12/2024. (Clemente Licea, O)
January 10, 2024 Filing 1 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture by United States of America. Attorney Khasigian, Kevin Christopher added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Khasigian, Kevin)
January 10, 2024 NEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED Forfeiture. (Clemente Licea, O)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approx. $6,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $6,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Daniel Paiz
Represented By: Jacek W. Lentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?