Robinson v. Delgado et al

Plaintiff: Anthony L. Robinson
Defendant: Anthony A. Lamarque, M. Monteiro, P. Mandeville, Mantel, D. C. Fletcher, R. McGowan, K. Trotta, M. Vidauri, J. A. Agamao, W. R. Davis, P. Olivarria, R. Delgado, A. Ortega, D. Much, James E. Tilton, Anthony Hedgpeth, Matthew Cate and Michael S Evans
Case Number: 1:2002cv01538
Filed: August 19, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motion Hearing reset for 3/8/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Changing hearing time from 3:45 p.m. to 1:00 p.m. same date.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/7/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
February 28, 2011 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling hearing to 3:45 p.m. re 353 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, 352 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/28/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 17, 2011 350 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET NO. 351. [ORDER by Magistrate Judge Vadas granting 319 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs.] (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011) Modified on 2/17/2011 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2010 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 341 Stipulation, filed by Anthony L. Robinson Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2011 04:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 12/8/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 12, 2010 331 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Service re 330 Order Granting Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Wtihdraw. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
August 31, 2010 316 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vadas Denying Post-Trial Motions and Entering Permanent Injunction. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 18, 2010 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Vadas denying without prejudice 304 Motion to Withdraw as Cousel of Record. Cooley LLP will be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff upon resolution of post-trial motions and filing, if appropriate, of a notice of appeal. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 17, 2010 314 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (CORRECTING HEARING DATE) vacating writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum and requiring Plaintiff to appear via video conference. Signed by Judge Vadas on August 17, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
June 2, 2010 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding documents filed by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Vadas on June 2, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 13, 2010 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Jury Commissioner to Furnish Daily Refreshments And Lunch During Deliberation.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/10/10. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 7, 2010 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 252 Proposed Order filed by Matthew Cate, P. Olivarria, R. Delgado. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/7/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 5, 2010 251 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Vadas on May 5, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 3, 2010 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas Granting In Part and Denying In Part the Parties' Motions in Limine 186 & 191 . Plaintiff to file amended complaint adding request for punitive damages by May 6, 2010. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 21, 2010 245 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued for inmate Anthony Robinson. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/20/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
August 26, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 226 Stipulation filed by Matthew Cate, Anthony L. Robinson, P. Olivarria, R. Delgado, Michael S Evans. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/26/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 19, 2009 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing status conference date from 8/25/09 to 9/14/09 at 10:00 a.m re 226 Stipulation filed by Matthew Cate, Anthony L. Robinson, P. Olivarria, R. Delgado, Michael S Evans Status Conference set for 9/14/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/19/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009) Modified on 8/26/2009 (glm, COURT STAFF).*** FILED IN ERROR.PLEASE SEE DOCKET #228***
June 17, 2009 221 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to transport issued for plaintiff to appear in US District Court on June 24, 2009. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/17/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
March 18, 2009 214 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/18/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009) Modified on 3/18/2009 (glm, COURT STAFF). Courtesy copies served by mail 3/18/09 on Out-to-Court Desk, Salinas Valley State Prison and Legal Affairs, San Quentin State Prison
December 3, 2008 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 205 MOTION to Substitute Party Defendants Suggestion on the Record to Substitute Anthony Hedgpeth for Defendant Michael Evans filed by Matthew Cate, A. Hedgpeth, P. Olivarria, R. Delgado, 206 Proposed Order filed by Matthew Cate, A. Hedgpeth, P. Olivarria, R. Delgado. Signed by Judge 12/3/08 on 12/3/08. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
September 16, 2008 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 199 granting STIPULATION Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
February 7, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 134 NOTICE by Anthony L. Robinson of New Authority in Support of Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/7/08. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Delgado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Robinson
Represented By: Angela Lucille Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony A. Lamarque
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Monteiro
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Mandeville
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantel
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. C. Fletcher
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. McGowan
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Trotta
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Vidauri
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. A. Agamao
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Olivarria
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Delgado
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ortega
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Much
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Tilton
Represented By: Julianne Mossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Hedgpeth
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael S Evans
Represented By: Emily L. Brinkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?