Wood et al v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Clarence Jonathon Wood and Heidi Collingswood
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv03335
Filed: February 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Vadas Taking Parties' Second Motions for Summary Judgment Under Submission, Vacating September 28, 2010 Hearing, and Granting Summary Judgment in Favor of Defendant Scottsdale Indemnity Company. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER GRANTING 112 Letter filed by Clarence Jonathon Wood for Mr. Wood to appear by phone at the 6/1/10 Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/15/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Denying as Moot Scottsdale Indemnity Company's Motion to File Statement of Recent Decision. Signed by Judge Vadas on 2/11/10. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re 86 Stipulation filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2009 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/6/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re 82 Stipulation filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/14/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER re 65 Stipulation, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/4/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request to Be Excused from Personal Attendance at Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/3/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re 53 Stipulation filed by Clarence Jonathon Wood continuing motion hearing to 9/1/09. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/21/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER to set date for exchange of expert reports re 48 Stipulation filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on June 15, 2009. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Stipulated Protective Order/Confidentiality Agreement Re Production Of Defendant Scottsdale Indemnity Company's Documents in Response to Plaintiff Wood's Notice Of Taking Deposition And For Production Of Documents re 45 Stipulation, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company, 46 Amended Document, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/26/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Stipulation, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/29/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER re 38 Stipulation, filed by Scottsdale Indemnity Company. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/18/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Jonathon Wood
Represented By: David Perrin Dibble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Collingswood
Represented By: Zachary Ethan Zwerdling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Indemnity Company
Represented By: William R. Fenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?