Miller v. Ladd
Plaintiff: Alyssa Miller
Defendant: Justin Shane Ladd
Case Number: 1:2008cv05595
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/14/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER vacating trial and related pretrial deadlines. Status Conference set for 1/25/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka. Signed by Judge Vadas on August 25, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka. Jury Trial set for 1/26/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka. Jury Trial set for 1/27/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Eureka. Signed by Judge Vadas on July 27, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER requiring Defendants to submit opposition or statement of non-opposition to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday June 23, 2010. Signed by Judge Vadas on June 21, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER approving 54 Stipulation to Modify Pre-Trial Order and Remove Unredacted Documents Attached. Signed by Judge Vadas on June 11, 2010. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER vacating the court's previously scheduled mediation date of May 31, 2010 and ordering mediation to be held before the pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/25/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 31 Stipulation filed by Alyssa Miller. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 6/17/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
May 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 4 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Justin Shane Ladd, 22 Proposed Order filed by Justin Shane Ladd. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/6/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER continuing status conference to 4/28/09 at 2:30 re 16 First MOTION to Continue Status Conference filed by Justin Shane Ladd. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/6/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Miller
Represented By: Richard E. Grabowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Shane Ladd
Represented By: Chris Carol Hamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?