Remington v. Mathson et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Remington
Defendant: John Mathson and Joy Mathson
Case Number: 1:2009cv04547
Filed: March 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901 Resource & Recovery Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re 95 Bill of Costs filed by John Mathson, Joy Mathson. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying Plaintiff's motion to overturn summary judgment. [Docket no. 98] (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER vacating pretrial conference and jury trial dates. Dates will be reset as needed following resolution of pending motion for summary judgment. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment /Partial Summary Judgment filed by John Mathson, Joy Mathson. Order taking motion under submission on the papers. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re 72 Order on Motion for Protective Order. Order taxing costs and expenses in the amount of $2,525.00 and ordering Plantiff to pay sanctions within ten days of entry of order. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER VACATING 9/27/11 motion date. Matter will be decided on the papers. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/19/11. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Certificate of Service By Mail re Docket No. 39. (cmw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER setting case management conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/29/10. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Remington v. Mathson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mathson
Represented By: Paul A. Brisso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Mathson
Represented By: Paul A. Brisso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?