McMartin v. Mendocino-Lake Community College District
Plaintiff: Duncan McMartin
Defendant: Mendocino-Lake Community College District
Case Number: 1:2012cv02446
Filed: May 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Dismissal with Prejudice and [Proposed] Order filed by Mendocino-Lake Community College District, Duncan McMartin. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 9, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO FILE STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 22, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 25 CONTINUING MEDIATION COMPLIANCE DATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Case referred to mediation. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 3/24/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 3/24/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/24/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 10 TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMartin v. Mendocino-Lake Community College District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duncan McMartin
Represented By: Susan Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mendocino-Lake Community College District
Represented By: Michael Charles Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?