HICA Education Loan Corporation v. Wanner
Plaintiff: HICA Education Loan Corporation
Defendant: Laurent E. Wanner
Case Number: 1:2012cv04156
Filed: August 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong ACCEPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING REFERENCE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENIED as moot 16 Motion to Appear by Telephone (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Reassigning Case to District Court Judge with Report and Recommendation on Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Nandor J Vadas on 10/31/12. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HICA Education Loan Corporation v. Wanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent E. Wanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HICA Education Loan Corporation
Represented By: Homan Mobasser
Represented By: Dean Russell Prober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?