Plyley v. Grangaard
Plaintiff: Gene Plyley
Defendant: Marlene L. Grangaard
Case Number: 1:2012cv05825
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 51 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND DISCOVERY SANCTION; AND VACATING HEARING.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014).
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/11/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014).
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 40 SECOND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/21/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2014).
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2014. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/12/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014).
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 28 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; LIFTING STAY ON DISCOVERY; AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; AND VACATING HEARING. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 32 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Mediation filed by Gene Plyley. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/7/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE SCOPE OF JOINT SITE INSPECTION re 12 Letter filed by Gene Plyley (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 12 Letter filed by Gene Plyley]. Responses due by noon on 3/29/2013. 3-hour meet-and-confer starting at 10:00 a.m.--1:30 p.m. 4/2/2013 (1/2 hour off at noon for lunch) in Court 9;s jury room on 19th Floor of federal courthouse in San Francisco. Discovery Hearing set for 4/2/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/25/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/11/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plyley v. Grangaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Plyley
Represented By: Jason K. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene L. Grangaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?