Environmental Protection Information Center v. Ayers et al
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Defendant: Jerry Ayers, Stafford Lehr, Charlton H. Bonham, Neil Manji, Pat Overton, Rowan Gould, Jeff Underwood and United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Case Number: 1:2013cv00656
Filed: February 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND TO RESOLVE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2015. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED STAY ORDER. The parties shall submit a joint case management statement by December 8, 2015 or within 14 days of approval of an HGMP for the Mad River Hatchery, whichever comes first. The stay shall be extended to November 30, 2015, or the date NMFS approves an HGMP for the Mad River Hatchery, whichever occurs first. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO AMEND STAY; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Plaintiff and Federal Defendants shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than December 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER APPROVING AMENDED STAY ORDER; DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Plaintiff and State Defendants shall file a Joint Status Report no later than December 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2014. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR STAY. The stipulation between plaintiff and the Federal Defendants to a stay of the proceedings related to the Federal Defendants is approved. The parties are ordered to submit a joint case management statement by June 13, 2014, or within 14 days following approval of the State Defendants' HGMP, whichever comes first. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 24, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING STATE DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO AMEND STIPULATED STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 3, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFF'S AND STATE DEFENDANTS' STIPULATION. Any and all litigation activity as to the State Defendants is stayed for one year. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 31, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ALLOW LEAVE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. The initial case management conference is continued from May 24, 2013 to May 31, 2013. All counsel shall appear telephonically at the May 31, 2013 case management conference. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 6, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Environmental Protection Information Center v. Ayers, 13-656 MMC, is referred, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12(c), to the Honorable Susan Illston for consideration of whether the case is related to Pace v. Bonham, 12-5610 SI. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 15, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PETER M.K. FROST PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2013)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Environmental Protection Information Center v. Ayers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Protection Information Center
Represented By: Sharon Eileen Duggan
Represented By: Peter M.K. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stafford Lehr
Represented By: Marc Nathaniel Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham
Represented By: Marc Nathaniel Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Manji
Represented By: Marc Nathaniel Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowan Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?