Paland v. Brooktrails Township C.S.D. et al
Plaintiff: David Paland
Defendant: Denise Marguerite Rose, Timothy Owen Ramming, Charles Anthony Orth, Roy Richard Williams and Brooktrails Township, C.S.D.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00631
Filed: February 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/7/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 47 Motion to Strike; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/26/14. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paland v. Brooktrails Township C.S.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Marguerite Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Owen Ramming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Anthony Orth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Richard Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooktrails Township, C.S.D.
Represented By: Christopher James Neary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Paland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?