Presley v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Melanie Carol Presley
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2014cv01814
Filed: April 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part plaintiff's 35 Motion for EAJA Fees. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REMANDING CASE.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/18/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2015)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order by Hon. James Donato denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 22 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presley v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Carol Presley
Represented By: Robert Chipley Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Paul Sachelari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?