Mendez v. California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.

Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Humbolt County Correctional Facility and Humbolt County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Ines Mendez
Case Number: 1:2014cv03756
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 24 & 27 Motions for Summary Judgment; Granting as to all federal claims and Dismissing all state law claims. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2015)
September 24, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Show Cause. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/24/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2015)
August 25, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Hearing set for 9/22/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/25/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2015)
August 12, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to remove 31 Opposition/Response & 30 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Ines Mendez, pursuant to 32 Order. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/12/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
August 11, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Status Conference set for 8/25/2015 10:00 AM / STRIKING 31 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Ines Mendez, 30 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Ines Mendez / VACATING trial dates. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/11/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
August 4, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/11/2015 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/4/2015 (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015)
July 28, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER taking Motions for summary judgment 27 & 24 under submission. 8/11/2015 hearing canceled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/28/2015. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
November 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER discharging 17 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/14/2014. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
October 31, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2014. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/31/14. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome M. Varanini, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humbolt County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humbolt County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Nancy K. Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ines Mendez
Represented By: Stephen T. Davies(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?