Borges v. City of Eureka et al
Plaintiff: Stephany Borges
Defendant: City of Eureka, Michael Stelzig, Bryan Franco, Drake Goodale, County of Humboldt, Michael Downey, Tim Hershberger, Terri Bittner, Nancy Corral, Tim Hammer, Leo Basler, Joshua Cardell, Kristina Lewis, Roselie Freixas, Michael Mendiburu and California Forensic Medical Group, Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2015cv00846
Filed: February 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/6/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 268 JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/30/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 252 Defendants' Motion to Offset Damage Award by Settlement Paid on Behalf of CFMG, Robert Eury and Ann Hampton. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 232 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying as moot 235 Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law regarding punitive damages. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 7. Order Regarding Motions in Limine, Objections to Classes of Exhibits, and Jury Questionnaire. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/8/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 6 REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBIT 28. Order to Show Cause Hearing re Defendants is set for Monday, 8/21/2017 08:01 AM at the United States Courthouse located at 3140 Boeing Avenue in McKinleyville CA. Show Cause Response due by 8/7/2017. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/3/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017) Modified on 8/3/2017 (fs, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 5 REGARDING THIRD PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/27/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 4 REGARDING LEGAL STANDARD FOR CONSTITUTIONAL CLAIM RE: MEDICAL CARE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/25/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 3 SETTING TRIAL SCHEDULE, TIME ALLOCATIONS, AND THIRD PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/17/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2 REGARDING FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/6/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/25/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 127 Stipulation Dismissing Defendants California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Ann Hampton and Robert Eury. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part and denying in part 67 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 72 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING;VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING.Compliance hearing set for 9/8/2016 at 9:01AM is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/31/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CLARIFY CLAIMS; CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance hearing set for 8/30/2016 at 2:01pm is CONTINUED to Thursday, 9/8/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER LIFTING STAY; SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/16/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER STAYING CASE; DENYING PENDING MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/29/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment /Summary Adjudication filed by Tim Hammer, Terri Bittner, Michael Downey, Tim Hershberger, Leo Basler, County of Humboldt, David Swim. The hearing set for June 28, 2016 is VACATED to be reset by the Court. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/23/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PRETRIAL DATES, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment /Summary Adjudication. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2016 02:00 PM in Cour troom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Hearing is set for 7/27/2016 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/28/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2016)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER RE: HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying without prejudice 76 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*] by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting in part 74 Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limitations.(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 42 Stipulation to Modify Scheduling Order; Vacating Case Management Conference; denying as moot 44 Motion to Appear by Telephone.Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2015 is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2015)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 38 Ex Parte Application to Appear at Settlement Conference by Phone filed by California Forensic Medical Group, Incorporated, Robert Eury, Ann Hampton. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/5/15. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/30/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/26/15. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borges v. City of Eureka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephany Borges
Represented By: John Cyrus Fattahi
Represented By: Dale Kristopher Galipo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Eureka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stelzig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Goodale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Humboldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Bittner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Corral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo Basler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roselie Freixas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mendiburu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?