Velasquez v. Tejeda et al

Plaintiff: Marcy Velasquez
Defendant: Engelberto Tejeda and Maria Molina
Case Number: 1:2015cv02261
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER. The action is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own attorney fees and costs. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 12, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
November 30, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 15 Letter/Request for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer filed by Maria Molina, Engelberto Tejeda. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
November 24, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE, ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER re 12 Letter filed by Marcy Velasquez. Signed by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/24/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
November 18, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF'S LETTER RE: SITE INSPECTION. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 72-1, plaintiff's letter and all further discovery matters are referred to a Magistrate Judge to be heard and considered at the convenience of the assigned Magistrate Judge's calendar. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2015. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
August 14, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/14/15. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Tejeda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Velasquez
Represented By: Jason K. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engelberto Tejeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?