Bennett-Wofford et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Gail Bennett-Wofford, Dana Wofford and Mark Bennett
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv02445
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/16/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2016)
January 19, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying Plaintiffs' Request to Reschedule Settlement Conference 42 . The settlement conference will go forward on January 26, 2016 as originally scheduled. All parties must attend, and must also comply with all instructions set forth in the court's December 14, 2015 scheduling order 37 .(dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 7, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/7/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett-Wofford et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Bennett-Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?