Devito et al v. Guidiville Rancheria of California et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Devito, Daniel Parks, Mabel Hughes, John Rhoads, Angelica Aguilar, Johnathan Ott and Serena Sagnibene
Defendant: Guidiville Rancheria of California, United Credit Specialists Recovery, Michael Derry, Jeff Winters and Charles I. Turner
Case Number: 1:2015cv04542
Filed: October 1, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Mendocino
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
November 30, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The conditional dismissal entered by the Court on October 27, 2016, is vacated, and the parties are directed to appear before the Court at a Case Management Conference on January 20, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on Novermber 30, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
October 27, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Plaintiffs having advised the Court that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this cause, it is ordered that plaintiffs' claims alleged against the remaining defendants herein be dismissed without prejudice; prov ided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this Court, within thirty days, with proof of service of a copy thereof on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing Order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 27, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
February 4, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/4/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devito et al v. Guidiville Rancheria of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Devito
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Parks
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabel Hughes
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rhoads
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Aguilar
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Ott
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serena Sagnibene
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidiville Rancheria of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Credit Specialists Recovery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Derry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles I. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?