Canaday et al v. Comcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Canaday and Daniel Murray
Defendant: Comcast Corporation and Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv04648
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Mendocino
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY NON-RESPONSIVE INDIVIDUAL PLAINTIFFS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED; REQUIRING SERVICE; REQUIRING PROPOSED ORDERS; AND VACATING HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/21/17. Show Cause Response due by 3/15/2017. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
October 18, 2016 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas in case 4:15-cv-04648-JSW; granting in part and denying in part (43) Discovery Letter Brief in case 4:16-cv-04177-JSW. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
August 22, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Comcast's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/22/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 4, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING TRANSFERRED CASES; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES IN RELATED CASES; DEFERRING RULING ON WHETHER STAYED CASES ARE RELATED; AND REQUIRING STATUS REPORT RE STAYED CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 13, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT FOR THE PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIHP BETWEEN CASES. Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2016. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/13/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
July 5, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/5/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016) Modified on 7/5/2016 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL ORDER DENYING TRANSFER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2710) The motion to transfer, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, on 06/02/16. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
February 22, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE BRIEFING OF TOLLING AND COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL ISSUES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/22/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 10, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2016)
January 15, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANANGEMENT CONFERENCES; REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANANGEMENT STATEMNTS; AND REQUIRING PARITES TO MEET AND CONFER RE COORDINATION OF RELATED CASES. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/15/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 16, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 16, 2015. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
October 14, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2015. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/14/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canaday et al v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Canaday
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Murray
Represented By: John Glugoski
Represented By: Matthew Righetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast of Contra Costa, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M. Doyle
Represented By: Allison B. Moser
Represented By: Emilie Reeslund
Represented By: Stephen Luther Taeusch
Represented By: Troy A. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?