Meniooh v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Rata Bey Meniooh
Defendant: State of California, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., California State Transportation Agency, Department of Motor Vehicles, Jean Shiomoto, California Superior Courts Agency, Law Enforcement Agency, Kamela Harris, John T. Feeney, Timothy P. Cissna, Marilyn B. Miles, Humbolt County and Michael T. Downey
Case Number: 1:2016cv00715
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2016 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 60 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)
September 22, 2016 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING COUNTY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/22/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
September 1, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/1/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 30, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/30/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
June 24, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 18 State Motion to Dismiss; granting 24 Judicial Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 1, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 32 REQUEST TO APPEAR (by telephone) filed by California Superior Courts Agency. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/31/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016) (note: counsel is to call the court for further instructions in appearing by telephone)
May 26, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/26/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
February 24, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/24/16. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meniooh v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rata Bey Meniooh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Transportation Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Shiomoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Superior Courts Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamela Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy P. Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn B. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humbolt County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?