Michael Thomas Meyer v. Carolyn W. Colvin

Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Meyer
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 1:2016cv01894
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 26 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS THIRD REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/26/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
December 9, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/9/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2016)
November 22, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER 21 FOR EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/22/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
September 16, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/16/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
August 18, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 16 IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Thomas Meyer v. Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Meyer
Represented By: Kenneth J. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?