John et al v. Garcia et al
Petitioner: Adrian John, Sr, Barbara Morinda, Michael Brown, Batsulwin Brown, Bonnie Sloan, Carrie Sloan, Cecil Brown, Cliff Mota Jr., David Brown, Elvina Brown, Ermadina Sloan, Geraldine Johnson, James P. Brown III, James Wright, Jessica Brown, Kiuya Brown, Ko-E-Ya John, Martha Morinda, Marvin Brown, Natasha Sloan, Nickle Appricio, Sharon Brown, Raymond Brown Jr., Robert Geary, Rose Brown, Roxann Morinda, Verdeana Mota, Mota Wah-Lia and Piyaco Brown
Respondent: Agustin Garcia, Sarah Brown Garcia, Nathan Brown, II, Stephanie Brown and Leora John
Case Number: 1:2016cv02368
Filed: April 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 74 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2018)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/7/2017. Show Cause Response due by 7/14/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF HEARING PENDING MEDIATION (granting 64 ) AND DENYING 60 REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/16/2017. Status Report due by 7/3/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 35 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 2/2/2017. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/31/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE RE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/24/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE RE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/6/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/2/2016. Replies due by 1/17/2017. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2017 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE REQUEST FOR AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/19/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2016)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR MEDIATION/SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/5/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST FOR AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/14/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING 13 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John et al v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Agustin Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sarah Brown Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nathan Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephanie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Leora John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian John, Sr
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barbara Morinda
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Batsulwin Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bonnie Sloan
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carrie Sloan
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cecil Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cliff Mota Jr.
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Elvina Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ermadina Sloan
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Geraldine Johnson
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James P. Brown III
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Wright
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kiuya Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ko-E-Ya John
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martha Morinda
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Natasha Sloan
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nickle Appricio
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sharon Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raymond Brown Jr.
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Geary
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rose Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roxann Morinda
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Verdeana Mota
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mota Wah-Lia
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Piyaco Brown
Represented By: LITTLE FAWN BOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?