Fortanel v. Ducart et al

Plaintiff: Librado Fortanel
Defendant: C. E. Ducart, Thomas Martinelli, Nancy Adam, Andrew Dorfman, Allison Rochuba, Nipa Tran, Edwin Ajimine, Mary Percy and Laurie Thomas
Case Number: 1:2016cv03946
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Marin
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION; DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time and denying 41 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Amended Complaint due by 6/4/2018. (Certificate of Service Attached) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 20, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 39 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Librado Fortanel. Amended Complaint due by 5/16/2018. (Certificate of Service attached) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION; DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Amended Complaint due by 4/16/2018. (Certificate of Service Attached)(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortanel v. Ducart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Librado Fortanel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. E. Ducart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Martinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Adam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Dorfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Rochuba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nipa Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Ajimine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?