Murray et al v. Spinning-wind et al

Plaintiff: Annika Murray and Eric Hutchinson
Defendant: Daniel Spinning-wind and Sharon Hutchins
Case Number: 1:2017cv06036
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Eureka Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Illman
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Stipulation FOR DISMISSAL. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 2/12/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue Settlement Conference filed by Annika Murray, Eric Hutchinson. Settlement Conference set for 2/12/2018 10:00 AM in McKinleyville. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 1/29/2018. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray et al v. Spinning-wind et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annika Murray
Represented By: John C Rarick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hutchinson
Represented By: John C Rarick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Spinning-wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Hutchins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?