Constantino et al v. Southern Humboldt Unified School District et al

Plaintiff: Ann Constantino
Defendant: Southern Humboldt Unified School District, Catherine Scott and Colleen O'Sullivan
Case Number: 1:2018cv02249
Filed: April 14, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Eureka Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Illman
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order 35 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting 27 Motion to Dismiss.(rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Colleen O'Sullivan, Catherine Scott, Southern Humboldt Unified School District. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 11/13/2018. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DATE FOR FIRST RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Colleen O'Sullivan, Catherine Scott, Southern Humboldt Unified School District. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/20/2018 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 9/7/2018. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Constantino et al v. Southern Humboldt Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Constantino
Represented By: Kevin Michael Schwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Humboldt Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?