Luiz v. Northern Circle Indian Housing Authority et al

Petitioner: Christian Luiz
Respondent: Amerind, Northern Circle Indian Housing Authority and Berkeley Risk Administrators
Case Number: 1:2018cv04712
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 25:640
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 11 Received Letter from Office of Hearing Examiners regarding service to AMERIND.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 25, 2018 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Amerind, Berkeley Risk Administrators, Northern Circle Indian Housing Authority.. (Weathers, Thomas) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Weathers (Weathers, Thomas) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Amerind, Berkeley Risk Administrators, Northern Circle Indian Housing Authority. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2018 10:00 AM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Responses due by 10/9/2018. Replies due by 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Weathers, Thomas) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 19, 2018 7 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Christian Luiz. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2018 02:00 PM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Responses due by 10/3/2018. Replies due by 10/10/2018. (Mahurin, Ronald) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 10, 2018 6 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mahurin, Ronald) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
August 24, 2018 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christian Luiz.. (Mahurin, Ronald) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 16, 2018 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/6/2018 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. Parties may participate in the Initial Case Management Conference by telephone and should contact Judge Illman's courtroom deputy for instructions. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 13, 2018 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christian Luiz. (Mahurin, Ronald) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 7, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Civil Case Filing fee of $400.00 not paid or Submit In Forma Pauperis Application. Please pay the filing fee through Pay.gov by clicking on Civil > ; Other Documents & New Case Filing Fee in CM/ECF. [err701] Also, E-File a request for Refund of the $5.00 Habeas Fee. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 0971-12570018.). Filed byChristian Luiz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mahurin, Ronald) (Filed on 8/6/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luiz v. Northern Circle Indian Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amerind
Represented By: Thomas Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Northern Circle Indian Housing Authority
Represented By: Thomas Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Berkeley Risk Administrators
Represented By: Thomas Weathers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christian Luiz
Represented By: Ronald Glenn Mahurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?