Bridges v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Kelvin Bridges
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv05764
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed in a Social Security Case by Kelvin Bridges. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/9/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman for all further proceedings. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/22/18. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/19/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kelvin Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO INFORM COURT WHETHER HE CONSENTS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/12/2018. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill.. (Naicker, Tina) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE DOCUMENTS as to #5 Summons Issued as to USA by U.S. Marshals Service. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Berryhill, #2 U.S. Attorney, #3 U.S. Attorney General)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Certificate of Service Attached). (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kelvin Bridges. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (IFPP). Filed by Kelvin Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rcsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridges v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Bridges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Tina Laxmi Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?