Johnson v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Lewis W. Johnson
Defendant: Craig Koenig, Wilbur Tucker and Patricia Hernandez
Case Number: 1:2019cv03936
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC AGB
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Statement of Account #6 : CDCR Statement Report and Certificate of Funds with Note. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Note, #2 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (msrS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/21/2019 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lewis W. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lewis W. Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/16/2019. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019) Modified on 7/10/2019 (msrS,
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patricia Hernandez, Craig Koenig, Wilbur Tucker (Filing fee IFPP). Filed byLewis W. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?